EP0188696 - Container-closing means with pressure indication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oriplast Gebr. Krayer GmbH, Herstellung und Vertrieb medizinischer und pharmazeutischer Artikel Hermannstrasse (Industriegebiet) D-6680 Neunkirchen / DE | [1987/25] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states Oriplast GmbH Gesellschaft für medizinischen Bedarf Hermannstrasse (Industriegebiet) D-6680 Neunkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krayer, Rolf Bahnhofstrasse 94 D-6601 Kleinblittersdorf 2 / DE | 02 /
Krayer, Paul Holbeinstrasse 3 D-6606 Gersweiler / DE | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Schönherr, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Wolfgang Schönherr Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Heinz Serwe Hawstrasse 28 D-54290 Trier / DE | [1986/31] | Application number, filing date | 85114779.3 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | DE19853501664 | 19.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3501664 | [1986/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188696 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188696 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188696 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
G01L7/086 (EP,US);
G01L7/082 (EP);
A61M1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Druckanzeigender Behälterverschluss | [1986/31] | English: | Container-closing means with pressure indication | [1986/31] | French: | Fermeture de récipient avec indication de pression | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2288530 (VEBO INSTITUTION READAPTATION [CH]); | [A]EP0066699 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]); | [A]EP0068824 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]) |