EP0223869 - Arrangement of feed-through terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.A. Weidmüller GmbH & Co. Postfach 950 Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | For all designated states C.A. Weidmüller GmbH & Co. Postfach 950 Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schild, Wolfgang Hoepker-Aschoff-Weg 26 D-4900 Herford / DE | 02 /
Conrad, Horst Dissestrasse 20 D-4930 Detmold / DE | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114819.7 | 21.11.1985 | [1987/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223869 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223869 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74, H01B17/30 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
H01R13/74 (EP,US);
H01B17/308 (EP,US);
H01R13/514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/23] | Title | German: | Durchführungsklemmenanordnung | [1987/23] | English: | Arrangement of feed-through terminals | [1987/23] | French: | Assemblage de bornes de traversée | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1101637 (AMP INC); | [A]US4073563 (BAILEY JAMES R, et al); | [A]GB2143996 (ITT); | [A]US2422379 (EDWARD WESTMAN SYDNEY) |