EP0184702 - Breakaway coupling for hydraulic conduits connectible at plug under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aeroquip GmbH Postfach 20 60, Ruhrstrasse 11 D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE | [1986/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steuerwald, Alfred Kirchheim Bolander Strasse 4 D-6719 Orbis / DE | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1986/25] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Bibrach Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Rehberg Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114842.9 | 22.11.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | DE19843444796 | 08.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3444796 | [1986/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184702 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184702 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184702 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L29/00, F16L37/28 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
F16L37/23 (EP);
F16L37/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/25] | F16L29/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1986/25] | Title | German: | Auch bei unter Druck stehendem Stecker kuppelbare Rohrabreisskupplung für Hydraulikleitungen | [1986/25] | English: | Breakaway coupling for hydraulic conduits connectible at plug under pressure | [1986/25] | French: | Raccord de rupture pour conduits hydrauliques pouvant être couplé à une fiche mâle sous pression | [1986/25] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 26.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3238410 ; | [A]DE2520393 |