EP0187938 - Device in the casing of a suction cleaner to indicate the saturation degree of the dust filter bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigt, Frieder, Dr. Berliner Strasse 22 D-8749 Bad Neustadt/Saale / DE | [1986/30] | Application number, filing date | 85115314.8 | 03.12.1985 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | DE19843446003 | 17.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3446003 | [1986/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187938 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/19 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
A47L9/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1986/30] | Title | German: | Einrichtung an einem Staubsaugergehäuse zur Anzeige des Füllungsgrades des Staubfilterbeutels | [1986/30] | English: | Device in the casing of a suction cleaner to indicate the saturation degree of the dust filter bag | [1986/30] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage logé dans le boîtier d'un aspirateur et indicant le taux de remplissage du filtre collecteur de poussières | [1986/30] | File destroyed: | 22.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/38] | 23.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1072791 ; | [A]US2114105 ; | [A]DE346584 ; | [A]FR2244438 ; | [A]FR1268820 |