EP0184196 - Plastic water header tank for a cross-flow radiator for internal-combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Temmesfeld, Axel Am Heilholz 40 D-8201 Bad Feilnbach / DE | 02 /
Tauber, Karl Schleissheimerstrasse 183 a D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Erwin, et al c/o Bayerische Motoren Werke AG - AJ-35 Postfach 40 02 40 Petuelring 130 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1987/26] |
Former [1986/24] | Schweiger, Erwin c/o Bayerische Motoren Werke AG - AJ-35 Postfach 40 02 40 Petuelring 130 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115360.1 | 04.12.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | DE19843444273 | 05.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3444273 | [1986/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184196 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184196 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/20, F01P11/02, F28F9/02 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
F01P11/029 (EP,US);
F28F21/067 (EP,US);
F28F9/0231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Aus Kunststoff hergestellter Wasserkasten für einen Querstrom- Kühler für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1986/24] | English: | Plastic water header tank for a cross-flow radiator for internal-combustion engines | [1986/24] | French: | Boîte à eau en plastique pour un radiateur à courant transversal pour machines à combustion interne | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/24] | 23.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4209062 (WOODHULL IVAN D JR [US]); | [A]GB2000856 (CHAUSSON USINES SA); | [A]US3604502 (MORSE JAMES D, et al) | Examination | DE2044033 |