EP0191168 - Device for the storage and time ordered taking of medicines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simon, Udo Ziegelsteinstrasse 212 D-8500 Nürnberg 10 / DE | [1986/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1986/34] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Dr.Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115447.6 | 05.12.1985 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | DE19850003564U | 09.02.1985 Original published format: DE 8503564 U | [1986/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191168 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191168 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191168 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/00, G04G15/00 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
A61J7/04 (EP,US);
A61J7/0481 (EP,US);
G04B37/127 (EP,US);
A61J1/035 (EP,US);
A61J7/0436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung und zur Erinnerung eines Patienten an eine erforderliche Einnahme von Arzneimitteln | [1990/11] | English: | Device for the storage and time ordered taking of medicines | [1986/34] | French: | Dispositif pour le stockage de médicaments et leur absorption provoquée en fonction du temps | [1986/34] |
Former [1986/34] | Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung und zeitlich veranlassten Einnahme von Arzneimitteln | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 26.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1993119U (MUENKEL HORST DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]DE2921520 (PELZER HELMUT); | [A]BE899066 (PRELLE DE LA NIEPPE CEDRIC DE); | [AD]DE3335301 (SIMON UDO [DE]); | [A]DE8318444U | Examination | EP0129785 |