EP0184782 - Sail arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hatlapa, Rolf In de Hörn 1 D-2082 Tornesch / DE | [1986/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115501.0 | 06.12.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | DE19843445146 | 11.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3445146 | [1986/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184782 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184782 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184782 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/06 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
B63B15/0083 (EP);
B63H9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/25] | Title | German: | Ausbildung einer Segelanordnung | [1986/25] | English: | Sail arrangement | [1986/25] | French: | Forme d'une voilure | [1986/25] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.01.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1988 | 01.01.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3656444 (KRATZ KENNETH E); | [X]US3838655 (KRATZ K); | [X]DE2334621 (DOEPNER RUDOLF); | [XP]FR2552390 (JULIAN YVON [FR]) |