EP0186078 - Mixing head for mixing at least two synthetic components forming a foam at their reaction, particularly polyurethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELASTOGRAN POLYURETHANE GMBH Landwehrweg D-49448 Lemförde / DE | [1987/48] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Elastogran Maschinenbau GmbH D-2844 Lemförde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallner, Josef Brauneckstrasse 2 D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Springer, Hans Jörg, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Springer, Hans Jörg, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115969.9 | 13.12.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | DE19843446818 | 21.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3446818 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186078 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186078 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186078 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/76 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
B29B7/7673 (EP,US);
B29C44/3442 (EP,US);
B29C44/581 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | Mischkopf zum Vermischen mindestens zweier bei ihrer Reaktion Schaumstoff bildender Kunststoffkomponenten, insbesondere Polyurethan | [1986/27] | English: | Mixing head for mixing at least two synthetic components forming a foam at their reaction, particularly polyurethane | [1986/27] | French: | Tête de mélange pour mélanger au moins deux composants synthétiques qui forment lors de leur réaction une mousse, en particulier du polyuréthane | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.03.1990 | FR | 07.03.1990 | GB | 07.03.1990 | SE | 07.03.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/35] | BE | 07.03.1990 | |
GB | 07.03.1990 | ||
SE | 07.03.1990 | ||
FR | 27.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | BE | 07.03.1990 | |
GB | 07.03.1990 | ||
SE | 07.03.1990 | ||
Former [1991/11] | GB | 07.03.1990 | |
SE | 07.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 07.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2847504 (DESMA WERKE GMBH); | [A]DE3005231 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]); | [A]DE3011132 (DESMA WERKE GMBH [DE]) |