EP0186839 - Polyorganosiloxane compositions for surface treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA SILICONE CO., LTD. 2-31, Roppongi 6-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | [1986/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumida, Heiju Toshiba Silicone Co., Ltd. 2-31, Roppongi 6-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo, 106 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Hiroshi Toshiba Silicone Co., Ltd. 2-31, Roppongi 6-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo, 106 / JP | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Sieb, Rolf, et al Finstertal 12 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Sieb, Rolf, Dr., et al Finstertal 12 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
Former [1986/40] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1986/28] | Catherine, Alain General Electric Company 42 Avenue Montaigne F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85116009.3 | 16.12.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | JP19840280859 | 29.12.1984 Original published format: JP 28085984 | [1986/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186839 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186839 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186839 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0186839 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/44 (US,EP);
C09D183/04, C08L83/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/28] | C08L89/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1986/28] | Title | German: | Polyorganosiloxanzusammensetzungen für eine Oberflächenbehandlung | [1986/28] | English: | Polyorganosiloxane compositions for surface treatment | [1986/28] | French: | Compositions de polyorganosiloxane pour le traitement de surface | [1986/28] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 11.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4252933 (SUMIDA HEIJI); | [A]GB1363069 (DOW CORNING LTD) |