EP0188757 - Microwave intrusion alarm system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pieverling, Klaus von, Dr.-Ing. Remiger Strasse 1 D-8190 Wolfratshausen / DE | [1986/31] | Application number, filing date | 85116110.9 | 17.12.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | DE19843446605 | 20.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3446605 | [1986/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188757 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/56, G01S7/28, G01S13/52 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
G01S13/538 (EP);
G01S13/56 (EP);
G01S7/2927 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Mikrowellen-Einbruchmeldesystem | [1986/31] | English: | Microwave intrusion alarm system | [1986/31] | French: | Dispositif micro-ondes de détection d'intrusion | [1986/31] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/03] | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4197537 ; | [Y]US4233604 ; | [Y]FR2241077 ; | [A]EP0107588 |