EP0185382 - Adapter for a refuse container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDELHOFF M.S.T.S. GMBH Heckenkamp D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | [1988/35] |
Former [1986/26] | For all designated states EDELHOFF POLYTECHNIK GMBH & CO. Heckenkamp 31 D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edelhoff, Gustav Dieter Langerfeldstrasse D-5860 Iserlohn / DE | [1986/26] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/26] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116290.9 | 19.12.1985 | [1986/26] | Priority number, date | DE19843446860 | 21.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3446860 | DE19853522902 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522902 | [1986/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0185382 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0185382 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185382 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14 | [1986/26] | CPC: |
B65F1/122 (EP);
B65F2220/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/26] | Title | German: | Adapter für ein Müllgefäss | [1986/26] | English: | Adapter for a refuse container | [1986/26] | French: | Adaptateur pour poubelles | [1986/26] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 23.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2621129 (SCHMID ERNEST); | [APD]EP0163859 ; | [AD]LU66441 |