EP0186156 - Light-sensitive composition with diazonium salt condensation products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1987/41] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOECHST CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walls, John E. 19 Bowlby Street Hampton, N.J. 08801 / US | 02 /
Liu, Shuchen 59 North Slope Clinton, N.J. 08809 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Euler, Kurt Emil, et al KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Euler, Kurt Emil, Dr., et al KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116339.4 | 20.12.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | US19840686778 | 27.12.1984 Original published format: US 686778 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186156 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186156 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/08 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
G03F7/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/27] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches Gemisch auf Basis von Diazoniumsalz-Kondensationsprodukten | [1986/27] | English: | Light-sensitive composition with diazonium salt condensation products | [1986/27] | French: | Composition photosensible à base de produits de condensation des sels de diazonium | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 13.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 08.11.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2980534 (PRINTY JOHN O, et al); | [Y]EP0061150 (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]); | [Y]US3867147 (TEUSCHER LEON A); | [Y]EP0071881 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE3311435 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0135026 (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]) |