EP0186884 - Spread spectrum communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 5-22, Kita Inoue-cho Higashino Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 5-22, Kita Inoue-cho Higashino Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeda, Shigeki 32-21 Maezawa 4-chome Higashikurume-shi Tokyo / JP | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116432.7 | 21.12.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | JP19840280988 | 29.12.1984 Original published format: JP 28098884 | [1986/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186884 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186884 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186884 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/66 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
H04B1/7156 (EP,US);
H04B2001/71566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/28] | Title | German: | Übertragungssystem mit gespreitztem Spektrum | [1986/28] | English: | Spread spectrum communication system | [1986/28] | French: | Système de communication à spectre étalé | [1986/28] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 02.09.1992 | FR | 02.09.1992 | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/26] | DE | 02.09.1992 | |
FR | 22.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/15] | DE | 02.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3983501 (LINDSTRUM ALAN L); | [A]DE2631460 (SIEMENS AG) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-29, no. 11, November 1981, pages 1644-1660, IEEE, New York, US; M.K. SIMON et al.: "Coherent detection of frequency-hopped quadrature modulations in the presence of jamming-Part 1: QPSK and QASK modulations" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-31, No. 8, August 1983, pages 955-964, IEEE, New York, US; C.A. PUTMAN et al.: "Tracking of frequency-hopped spread-spectrum signals in adverse environments" |