EP0226656 - Door stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marley Werke GmbH Postfach 1140 D-31513 Wunstorf / DE | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schettlinger, Hans Marley Werke GmbH Postfach 1140 D-3050 Wunstorf 1 / DE | 02 /
Lockemann, Klaus Marley Werke GmbH Postfach 1140 D-3050 Wunstorf 1 / DE | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116469.9 | 23.12.1985 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226656 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/44 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
E05C17/446 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1987/27] | Title | German: | Türstopper | [1987/27] | English: | Door stop | [1987/27] | French: | Arrêt de porte | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1371100 ; | [X]FR1397866 |