EP0187382 - Plasmid, method for construction of the same, microorganism carrying the plasmid and method for cultivation of the microorganism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horikoshi, Koki No. 4-39-8, Sakuradai Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116611.6 | 27.12.1985 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | JP19840278681 | 28.12.1984 Original published format: JP 27868184 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0187382 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0187382 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187382 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N15/56, C12N1/21, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:19) | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N9/248 (EP);
C12N9/86 (EP);
C12Y302/01008 (EP);
C12Y302/01032 (EP);
C12Y305/02006 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1986/29] | C12N15/00, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:19) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1986/29] | Title | German: | Plasmid, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung, dieses Plasmid enthaltender Mikroorganismus und Verfahren zur Züchtung des Mikroorganismus | [1986/29] | English: | Plasmid, method for construction of the same, microorganism carrying the plasmid and method for cultivation of the microorganism | [1986/29] | French: | Plasmide, son procédé de préparation, micro-organisme contenant ce plasmide et procédé de culture de ce micro-organisme | [1986/29] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121138 | [T] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 50, no. 4, 1986, pages 1067,1068; C. KATO et al.: "Extracellular production of xylanase" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 19, 9th May 1977, page 264, abstract no. 136179y, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.L. RODRIGUEZ et al.: "Construction and characterization of cloning vehicles", & ICN-UCLA SYMP. MOL. CELL. BIOL. 1976, 5(Mol. Mech. Control Gene Expression), 471-7 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 25, 23rd December 1985, page 272, abstract no. 208072c, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. KUDO et al.: "Molecular cloning and expression of a xylanase gene of alkalophilic Aeromonas sp. no. 212 in Escherichia coli.", & J. GEN. MICROBIOL. 1985, 131(10), 2825-30 | [T] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 9, 1st September 1986, page 154, abstract no. 73432p, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. KOBAYASHI et al.: "Excretion of the penicillinase of an alkalophilic bacillus sp. through the Escherichia coli outer membrane is caused by insertional activation of the kil gene in plasmid pMB9", & J. BACTERIOL. 1986, 166(3), 728-32 |