EP0150885 - Semiconductor device for producing an electron beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Mast, Karel Diederick c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Hoeberechts, Arthur Marie Eugene c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
van Gorkom, Gerardus Gegorius Petrus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200083.5 | 28.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | NL19840000297 | 01.02.1984 Original published format: NL 8400297 | [1985/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150885 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150885 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150885 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/30, H01J29/04, H01J37/073 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
H01J1/308 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/32] | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Elektronenstrahles | [1985/32] | English: | Semiconductor device for producing an electron beam | [1985/32] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteur émettant un faisceau d'électrons | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 13.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56160740 ; | [A]US3581151 (BOYLE WILLARD S, et al); | [A]US4168213 (HOEBERECHTS ARTHUR M E); | [A]GB2054959 (PHILIPS NV) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 47 (E-99)[925], 26th March 1982, page 12E99; & JP-A-56 160 740 (SONY K.K.) 10-12-1981, & JP56160740 A 00000000 |