EP0150887 - Remote controlled agricultural machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/32] | Apparatus and method for controlling or monitoring agricultural machines | ||
[1990/18] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.01.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1992 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states SPERRY N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strubbe, Gilbert J.I. Loppemsestraat 58b B-8021 Loppem-Zedelgem / BE | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic T.J., et al New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 85200086.8 | 28.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | GB19840002548 | 31.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8402548 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150887 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150887 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150887 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01D73/00, A01D43/06 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
A01D41/04 (EP);
A01D43/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/32] | Title | German: | Ferngesteuerte landwirtschaftliche Maschine | [1990/18] | English: | Remote controlled agricultural machine | [1990/18] | French: | Machine agricole contròlée à distance | [1990/18] |
Former [1985/32] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Kontrolle von landwirtschaftlichen Maschinen | ||
Former [1985/32] | Apparatus and method for controlling or monitoring agricultural machines | ||
Former [1985/32] | Procédé et appareil pour le contrôle de machines agricoles | Examination procedure | 28.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1991
28.03.1991
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werk H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 51 D-49202 Hasbergen / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1991
28.03.1991
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werk H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 51 D-49202 Hasbergen / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | 13.03.1991 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.03.1991 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.04.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.09.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1632824 ; | [A]DE2807887 ; | [A]US4031963 ; | [A]GB2073914 ; | [A]EP0070340 |