EP0155712 - Cloth, in particular for use in paper making machines, and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states v. Asten, Fabrique de Feutres pour Papeteries, société cooperative Buschberg Eupen (Kettenis) / BE | [1985/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malmendier, Joseph Rosenweg, 21 B-4700 Eupen / BE | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Claeys, Pierre, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 85200143.7 | 08.02.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | FR19840003144 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8403144 | [1985/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155712 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155712 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00, D03D11/00 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
D21F1/0036 (EP,US);
B29L2031/733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Gewebe, insbesondere zum Einsatz in Papiermaschinen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1985/39] | English: | Cloth, in particular for use in paper making machines, and method of making the same | [1985/39] | French: | Toile destinée en particulier aux machines à papier, et son procédé de préparation | [1985/39] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.1987 | IT | 09.09.1987 | SE | 30.09.1987 | CH | 29.02.1988 | LI | 29.02.1988 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.09.1987 | |
IT | 09.09.1987 | ||
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
CH | 29.02.1988 | ||
LI | 29.02.1988 | ||
Former [1989/27] | AT | 09.09.1987 | |
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
CH | 29.02.1988 | ||
LI | 29.02.1988 | ||
Former [1989/19] | AT | 09.09.1987 | |
SE | 30.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 09.09.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2269869 (SPECHT HARRY G); | [A]US2316818 (STYBR MILES A); | [AD]FR2407291 (JWI LTD [CA]); | [AD]EP0036527 (JWI LTD [CA]); | [A]EP0097966 (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) |