EP0156419 - Conveying rope with plastic scraping elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.1987 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1987 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirovano, Camillo Via Puecher 4 22052 Cernusco Lombardone (Como) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Pirovano, Camillo Via Puecher 4 I-22052 Cernusco Lombardone (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Martegani, Franco Ingg. GUZZI e RAVIZZA S.r.l. Via Boccaccio, 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Martegani, Franco Ingg. GUZZI e RAVIZZA S.r.l. Via Boccaccio, 24 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85200304.5 | 04.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | IT19840020245 | 27.03.1984 Original published format: IT 2024584 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156419 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156419 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65G19/24 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
B65G19/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | B65G19/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Förderseil mit Kratzerelementen aus Kunststoff | [1985/40] | English: | Conveying rope with plastic scraping elements | [1985/40] | French: | Cable de transport avec des éléments de raclage en matière plastique | [1985/40] | File destroyed: | 22.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 13.11.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1342628 [ ]; | FR1549145 [ ]; | GB1511996 [ ] (GERICKE AG); | DE2809687 [ ] (GALVELPOR SA) |