EP0159074 - Magnetic bend segment for a chain conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 26.04.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1990 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.C.C. Nederland B.V. Wattstraat 3 NL-2691 GZ 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1985/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallaart, Jacobus Johannes Esdoornstraat 41 NL-2691 VG 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1985/43] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir. c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200455.5 | 22.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19840008857U | 22.03.1984 Original published format: DE 8408857 U | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159074 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159074 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/20 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B65G21/2009 (EP,US);
B65G21/20 (KR);
B65G21/06 (EP,US);
B65G21/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Bogenstück für Kettenförderer | [1985/43] | English: | Magnetic bend segment for a chain conveyor | [1985/43] | French: | Segment magnétique pour transporteur à chaîne | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.03.1988
05.07.1988
ADMISSIBLE Knauer, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Lerchenweg 2 D-85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.03.1988
05.07.1988
ADMISSIBLE Knauer, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Lerchenweg 2 D-85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.03.1988
Knauer, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Lerchenweg 2 D-85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Beszédes, Stephan G., Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 D-85201 Dachau / DE | 07.07.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.01.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.09.1989 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1115252 (BAKER PERKINS LTD); | [A]DE1556183 ; | [A]US3964800 (GRIMES DONALD D, et al); | [AD]GB2037690 (GEFRA BV) |