EP0164138 - Data processing system with a plurality of input/output buses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION Route 9 Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION Route 9 Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernstein, David H. 252 Delphi Circle Los Altos California 94022 / US | 02 /
Carberry, Richard A. 23965 Glenwood Drive Los Gatos California 95030 / US | 03 /
Druke, Michael B. 32 Longmeadow Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | 04 /
Gusowski, Ronald I. 5 Baxter Street Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | 05 /
Buckley, Edward M. 68 Dutcher Street Hopedale Massachusetts 01747 / US | 06 /
March, Roger W. 3422 Georgetown Place Santa Clara California 95051 / US | [1989/33] |
Former [1986/15] | 01 /
Bernstein, David H. 252 Delphi Circle Ashland Massachusetts 01721 / US | ||
02 /
Carberry, Richard A. 23965 Glenwood Drive Los Gatos California 95030 / US | |||
03 /
Druke, Michael B. 32 Longmeadow Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | |||
04 /
Gusowski, Ronald I. 5 Baxter Street Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | |||
05 /
Buckley, Edward M. 68 Dutcher Street Hopedale Massachusetts 01747 / US | |||
06 /
March, Roger W. 3422 Georgetown Place Santa Clara California 95051 / US | |||
Former [1986/06] | 01 /
Bernstein, David H. 41 Bay Colony Drive Ashland Massachusetts 01721 / US | ||
02 /
Carberry, Richard A. 23965 Glenwood Drive Cupertino California 95014 / US | |||
03 /
Druke, Michael B. 32 Longmeadow Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | |||
04 /
Gusowski, Ronald I. 5 Baxter Street Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | |||
05 /
Buckley, Edward M. 68 Dutcher Street Hopedale Massachusetts 01747 / US | |||
06 /
March, Roger W. 3422 Georgetown Place Santa Clara California 95051 / US | |||
Former [1985/50] | 01 /
Bernstein, David H. 41 Bay Colony Drive Ashland Massachusetts 01721 / US | ||
02 /
Carberry, Richard A. 10082 Firwood Drive Cupertino California 95014 / US | |||
03 /
Druke, Michael B. 32 Longmeadow Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | |||
04 /
Gusowski, Ronald I. 5 Baxter Street Westboro Massachusetts 01581 / US | |||
05 /
Buckley, Edward M. 68 Dutcher Street Hopedale Massachusetts 01747 / US | |||
06 /
March, Roger W. 3422 Georgetown Place Santa Clara California 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85200462.1 | 11.02.1981 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19800120272 | 11.02.1980 Original published format: US 120272 | US19800120271 | 11.02.1980 Original published format: US 120271 | US19800120291 | 11.02.1980 Original published format: US 120291 | US19800120292 | 11.02.1980 Original published format: US 120292 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164138 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164138 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/22, G06F13/40 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
H03K23/667 (EP,US);
G06F13/22 (EP);
G06F13/36 (EP);
G06F13/4027 (EP);
G06F13/42 (EP);
G06F13/4217 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit mehreren Eingangs-/Ausgangsbussen | [1985/50] | English: | Data processing system with a plurality of input/output buses | [1985/50] | French: | Système de traitement de données avec plusieurs bus d'entrée-sortie | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP81300560.0 / EP0035334 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.08.1989 | IT | 16.08.1989 | LI | 16.08.1989 | NL | 16.08.1989 | SE | 16.08.1989 | [1999/42] |
Former [1990/19] | CH | 16.08.1989 | |
LI | 16.08.1989 | ||
NL | 16.08.1989 | ||
SE | 16.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/17] | CH | 16.08.1989 | |
LI | 16.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4000485 (BARLOW GEORGE J, et al) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, vol. NS-26, no. 4, August 1979, pages 4525-4530, New York, US; R.W.DOWNING: "Fastbus - Details of addressing and bus mastership" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, vol. NS-26, no. 1, February 1979, pages 679-685, New York, US; R.S.LARSEN: "Status of the interlaboratory development of a high-speed standard data bus - fastbus" | [AD] - IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, COMPCON 75, 25th-27th February 1975, San Francisco, pages 27-30, New York, US; A.BAUM et al.: "Hardware considerations in a microcomputer multiprocessing system" | Examination | US3221307 |