EP0156445 - Device for discharging receptacles, especially refuse receptacles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zöller-Kipper GmbH Hans-Zöller-Strasse 50-68 55130 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Zöller-Kipper GmbH Hans-Zöller-Strasse 50-68 D-55130 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naab, Jakob Am Bornberg 13 D-6500 Mainz 43 / DE | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Seids, Heinrich Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt, Dipl.-Phys. Seids, Dr. Mehler Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Seids, Heinrich, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt, Dipl.-Phys. Seids, Dr. Mehler Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 85200470.4 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | DE19843405997 | 20.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3405997 | [1985/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156445 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156445 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156445 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65F3/04 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
B65F3/06 (EP,US);
B65F1/1484 (EP,US);
B65F3/043 (EP,US);
B65F2003/022 (EP,US);
B65F2003/024 (EP,US);
B65F2003/0253 (EP,US);
B65F2003/0256 (EP,US);
B65F2210/1123 (EP,US);
B65F2210/164 (EP,US);
B65F3/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/24] |
Former [1985/40] | IT | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entleeren von Behältern, insbesondere Müllbehältern | [1985/40] | English: | Device for discharging receptacles, especially refuse receptacles | [1985/40] | French: | Dispositif pour le déchargement de récipients, en particulier de récipients à ordures | [1985/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1987/24: Verbunden mit 85901399.7/0173727 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 16.04.87 | EPB 1987/24: Consolidated with 85901399.7/0173727 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 16.04.87 | EPB 1987/24: Jointe à la demande no. 85901399.7/0173727 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 16.04.87 | Examination procedure | 01.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 25.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.1985 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   10.05.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1028935 [ ] (HANS ZOELLER); | AT302902B [ ] (OCHSNER & CIE AG J [CH]); | DE2300574 [ ] (KOELLER WOLFGANG); | DE2721059 [ ] (KUEPPER SEVERIN); | US4417839 [ ] (WHITEHEAD JR WILLIAM F [US], et al) |