EP0159748 - Flame protection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Kampen, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Zwaan, Andries Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/44] |
Former [1985/44] | Groenenberg, Johannes Hendrik INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200509.9 | 01.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | NL19840001173 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: NL 8401173 | [1985/44] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159748 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159748 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/12 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
F23N5/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/44] | Title | German: | Flammen-Schutzschaltung | [1985/44] | English: | Flame protection circuit | [1985/44] | French: | Circuit de protection pour flamme | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 08.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU510777 ; | [A]US4188181 (BAYSINGER ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US4000961 (MANDOCK RICHARD F); | [A]GB2018969 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]GB2081873 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | Examination | GB730619 |