EP0161713 - Drilling apparatus for drilling holes in glass sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1989 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CondenSafe B.V. Kerkstraat 378-382 NL-1017 JB Amsterdam / NL | [1985/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Suchtelen, Marco Geerdinkhof 147 NL-1103 PV Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Veenendaal, Jan Geerdinkhof 118 NL-1103 PT Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
van Zaanen, Johan Jacob Geerdinkhof 119 NL-1103 PT Amsterdam / NL | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200693.1 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | NL19840001434 | 04.05.1984 Original published format: NL 8401434 | [1985/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161713 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161713 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161713 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04, B23B41/00, B25B11/00 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
F03B5/00 (EP);
B23B41/00 (EP);
B23B51/0426 (EP);
B23Q1/70 (EP);
B23Q11/006 (EP);
B23Q5/06 (EP);
B25B11/005 (EP);
B28D1/041 (EP);
B28D7/04 (EP);
E06B3/677 (EP);
B23B2226/45 (EP);
Y02E10/20 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Bohrvorrichtung zum Bohren von Löchern in Glasscheiben | [1985/47] | English: | Drilling apparatus for drilling holes in glass sheets | [1985/47] | French: | Dispositif de perçage pour percer des trous dans des plaques de verre | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 05.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87200883.4 / EP0240093 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.08.1986 | M02   Fee paid on   27.10.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US1729131 [ ] (SHAFF ERNEST H); | US2124609 [ ] (DICKENSON ERNEST H); | US2906256 [ ] (GLYNN THEODORE W); | GB1036586 [ ] (BERTIN & CIE); | DE1461114 [ ] (HAMMELMANN PAUL); | US3690780 [ ] (BJELLAND JOHN LOUIS, et al); | US4101238 [ ] (REIBETANZ WILBERT, et al); | FR2389761 [ ] (AUDI AG [DE]); | GB2032830 [ ] (SECR DEFENCE) |