EP0168071 - Semiconductor device manufacture using molecular beam epitaxy with source temperature control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foxon, Charles Thomas c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LABORATORIES Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Boxall, Robin John, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85200730.1 | 10.05.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | GB19840012275 | 14.05.1984 Original published format: GB 8412275 | [1986/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168071 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168071 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C30B23/06 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
C30B23/06 (EP,US);
Y10S148/006 (EP,US);
Y10S148/169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/03] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Halbleiterbauelementen mittels Molekularstrahlepitaxie mit gesteuerter Quellentemperatur | [1986/03] | English: | Semiconductor device manufacture using molecular beam epitaxy with source temperature control | [1986/03] | French: | Fabrication de dispositifs semi-conducteurs par épitaxie à jets moléculaires avec contrôle de la température des sources | [1986/03] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3974002 (CASEY JR HORACE CRAIG, et al); | [A]US4426569 (MILLER MARK C [US], et al) | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 43, 1974; Supplement : "Proceedings of the 5th Solid State Devices L. ESAKI "Computer-controlled molecular beam epitaxy", pages 452-460 |