EP0162515 - Ultrasonic transducer devices using an array of piezoelectric transducer elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:BE
DE
GB
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:BE
DE
GB
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1985/48] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:BE
DE
GB
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coursant, Roger Henri Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 Rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian, et al Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | Landousy, Christian, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85200735.0 | 10.05.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | FR19840007957 | 22.05.1984 Original published format: FR 8407957 | [1985/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162515 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162515 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/34 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
B06B1/0622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Ultraschallwandlervorrichtung mit einer Anordnung von piezoelektrischen Wandlerelementen | [1985/48] | English: | Ultrasonic transducer devices using an array of piezoelectric transducer elements | [1985/48] | French: | Dispositif de transduction ultrasonore à réseau d'éléments transducteurs piézoélectrique | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 23.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.08.1990 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - ULTRASONICS, vol. 19, no. 2, mars 1981, pages 81-86, IPC Business Press, Guildford, Surrey, GB; M. PAPPALARDO: "Hybrid linear and matrix acoustic arrays" | [ ] - SIEMENS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT REPORTS, vol. 9, no. 4, 1980, pages 231-235, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; I. FEIGT et al.: " Bildqualität bei Ultraschallgruppenantennen für die medizinische Realzeitdiagnostik" | [ ] - HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, vol. 34, no. 10, octobre 1983, pages 17-22, Amstelveen, NL; J.D. LARSON: "An acoustic transducer array for medical imaging - Part I" | Examination | - Proc IEEE, 1983, Ultrasonics Symposium, Atlanta, pp. 773-777 | - Acta Electronica, 25, 4, 1983, pp. 325-340 |