EP0165634 - Method of visualizing individual submicroscopic metal particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutsebaan 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Brabander, Marc Joris Valerialaan 2 B-2153 Zoersel / BE | 02 /
Geuens, Gustaaf Maria Albert Groot Kapellen 46 B-2400 Mol / BE | 03 /
Nuydens, Rony Maria Duivenstraat 18 B-2350 Vosselaar / BE | 04 /
Moeremans, Marc Karel Julia Jozef Donk 90 B-2400 Mol / BE | [1985/52] | Application number, filing date | 85200862.2 | 30.05.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | US19840622923 | 21.06.1984 Original published format: US 622923 | [1985/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165634 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165634 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165634 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G02B21/12, G01N33/53, G01N21/21, G01N15/14 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
G02B21/12 (EP,US);
G01N15/147 (EP,US);
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
G01N33/553 (EP,US);
G02B21/0004 (EP,US);
G01N21/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sichtbarmachen von gesonderten submikroskopischen Metallteilchen | [1985/52] | English: | Method of visualizing individual submicroscopic metal particles | [1985/52] | French: | Méthode pour la visualisation de particules métalliques individuelles submicroscopiques | [1985/52] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4000417 (ADKISSON WILLIAM M, et al); | [Y]EP0007654 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [YD]US4420558 (DE MEY JAN R [BE], et al) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, vol. PAMI-3, no. 6, November 1981, page 655-661, New York, US; P.M. NARENDRA et al.: "Real-Time Adaptive Contrast Enhancement" | [A] - H. APPELT "Einführung in die mikroskopischen Untersuchungsmethoden", 4. Ausgabe, Akademische Verlagsgesellschaft Geest & Portig K.G., 1959, Leipzig |