EP0168855 - Automatic device for the drawing of bundles of welded bags of plastic material and for the insertion thereof into container means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luoni, Marco Via Leonardo da Vinci 33 I-20020 Dairago Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states Luoni, Marco Via Leonardo da Vinci 33 I-20020 Dairago Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85200908.3 | 10.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | IT19840022340U | 20.06.1984 Original published format: IT 2234084 U | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0168855 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0168855 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168855 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/16 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
B65B35/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/04] | Title | German: | Automatische Vorrichtung zum Ziehen von Bündeln verschweisster Tüten aus Kunststoff und zu deren Hineinstecken in Behälter | [1986/04] | English: | Automatic device for the drawing of bundles of welded bags of plastic material and for the insertion thereof into container means | [1986/04] | French: | Dispositif automatique pour tirer des paquets de sacs soudés en matière plastique et pour les insérer dans des récipients | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 05.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.1989 | CH | 12.04.1989 | LI | 12.04.1989 | [2015/21] |
Former [1990/09] | AT | 12.04.1989 | |
CH | 12.04.1989 | ||
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1989 | ||
Former [1990/05] | CH | 12.04.1989 | |
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
BE | 30.06.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 30.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2677317 (VOGT CLARENCE W); | [A]US3085501 (WIMMER GLEN E); | [A]FR2118306 (HOLWEG CONST MEC, et al); | [A]DE2248365 (FMC CORP) |