EP0205671 - Industrial washing machine with improved product concentration control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.08.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1990/03] | For:DE
FR
IT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1989/45] | For:DE
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1986/52] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peschel, Karl-Heinz Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 5 D-6942 Mörlenbach / DE | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik, Dr., et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1988/19] | van Gent, Jan Paulus Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1986/52] | Mole, Peter Geoffrey UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85201012.3 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205671 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205671 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, D06F31/00 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
D06F31/005 (EP,US);
D06F34/22 (EP,US);
D06F2103/22 (EP,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/11] |
Former [1986/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Industrielle Waschmaschine mit Vorrichtung zum Einstellen des Konzentrationsprodukts | [1986/52] | English: | Industrial washing machine with improved product concentration control | [1986/52] | French: | Machine à laver industrielle avec dispositif de réglage de la concentration du produit | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, NL | 04.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.1990
24.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.1990
24.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 23.11.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.10.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.05.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.06.1991 | SE | 26.06.1991 | FR | 28.02.1992 | [1992/45] |
Former [1992/34] | GB | 25.06.1991 | |
SE | 26.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | SE | 26.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1292039 ; | [A]US3645669 (RAUSCH GERHARD); | [A]US3335501 (JANKE DONALD E, et al) |