EP0173362 - Arrangement of recovering a clock signal form an angle-modulated carrier signal having a modulation index m = 0.5 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, Kah-Seng INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | van den Brom, Arend Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Van den Brom, Arend Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201141.0 | 09.07.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | NL19840002352 | 26.07.1984 Original published format: NL 8402352 | [1986/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173362 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173362 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02, H04L27/14 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
H04L7/027 (EP,US);
H04L27/233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung eines Taktsignals aus einem winkelmodulierten Trägersignal mit einem Modulationsindex von 0,5 | [1986/10] | English: | Arrangement of recovering a clock signal form an angle-modulated carrier signal having a modulation index m = 0.5 | [1986/10] | French: | Dispositif de récupération d'un signal d'horloge d'une onde porteuse modulée en angle comportant un indice de modulation égal à 0,5 | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.03.1989 | [1990/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0026064 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]); | [A]US4096442 (MCRAE DANIEL DIX, et al) | [A] - IEEE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS, 23rd-26th March 1981, Genoa, IT, pages 311-318, IEEE, New York, US; J.C. IMBEAUX: "Performances of the delay-line multiplier circuit for clock and carrier recovery in digital satellite transmissions" | [A] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, vol. 2/3, 29th November - 2nd December 1982, Miami, US, pages 877-883, IEEE, New York, US; T. AULIN et al.: "Synchronization properties of continuous phase modulation" |