EP0170335 - Bumper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1986/25] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beekman, Arie Willem Margrietstraat 40 NL-6155 LB Puth-Schinnen / NL | 02 /
van Dalen, Hendrik Elisabethstraat 24 NL-6161 GT Geleen / NL | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1988/17] |
Former [1986/06] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201225.1 | 23.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | NL19840002333 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: NL 8402333 | [1986/06] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170335 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170335 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R2019/1846 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/06] | Title | German: | Stossdämpfer | [1986/06] | English: | Bumper | [1986/06] | French: | Pare-chocs | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2345315 ; | [A]DE2433137 ; | [A]FR1336323 ; | [A]GB2084942 ; | [AD]US4072334 ; | [AD]DE2331450 |