EP0175399 - Process for obtaining ethylene from ethanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Belgische Staat L'Etat Belge représenté par le Secrétaire général des Services de Programmation de la politique scientifique Rue de la Science, 8 B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | [1986/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Julia M. St. Jozeflei, 24 B-2140 Malle / BE | 02 /
Jacobs, Pierre A. Strijlandstraat, 104 B-1686 Gooik / BE | 03 /
Uytterhoeven, Jan B. Rotspoelstraat, 3 B-3300 Heverlee / BE | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | De Palmenaer, Roger, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Livornostraat 7 1060 Brussel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | De Palmenaer, Roger, et al Bureau Vander Haeghen S.A. Rue Colonel Bourg 108 A B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1986/13] | De Brabanter, Maurice Bureau VANDER HAEGHEN 63 Avenue de la Toison d'Or B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 85201301.0 | 13.08.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | LU19840085515 | 28.08.1984 Original published format: LU 85515 | [1986/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0175399 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175399 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/24, C07C11/04 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
C07C1/24 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Äthylen aus Äthanol | [1986/13] | English: | Process for obtaining ethylene from ethanol | [1986/13] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'éthylène à partir d'éthanol | [1986/13] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.1988 | GB | 30.11.1988 | NL | 30.11.1988 | SE | 30.11.1988 | [2000/03] |
Former [1989/52] | AT | 30.11.1988 | |
NL | 30.11.1988 | ||
SE | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/46] | AT | 30.11.1988 | |
SE | 30.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 30.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2306961 (MOBIL OIL [US]); | [A]US4011278 (PLANK CHARLES J, et al); | [AD]EP0022640 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]); | [AD]FR2240281 (MOBIL OIL [US]); | [A]EP0104800 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) |