EP0178739 - Apparatus for supplying food to a plurality of cages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malestein, Teus Stationsweg 49 Nl-3771 VC Barneveld / NL | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, Ir., et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201673.2 | 11.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | NL19840003159 | 16.10.1984 Original published format: NL 8403159 | NL19840003160 | 16.10.1984 Original published format: NL 8403160 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178739 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178739 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178739 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/02, A01K39/012 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
A01K5/02 (EP,US);
A01K39/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/17] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Liefern von Futter an eine Vielzahl von Käfigen | [1986/17] | English: | Apparatus for supplying food to a plurality of cages | [1986/17] | French: | Appareil pour distribuer de la nourriture à une pluralité de cages | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2007486 ; | [X]NL7400097 ; | [A]AT316917B (HYGENIC ENTWICKLUNG HERSTELLUN); | [AD]CA978037 (CRAWFORDS FOODS LTD); | [A]EP0011397 (CHORE TIME EQUIPMENT [US]); | [A]EP0056733 (US INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | [A]EP0060009 (CHORE TIME NV [BE]); | [A]GB2129266 (HARVEY JOHN STANDISH, et al) | Examination | GB1460035 |