EP0181665 - Method of transmitting information in a digital transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwaga, Bocke c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Haveman, Hendrik Jan c/o INT.OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201743.3 | 28.10.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | NL19840003324 | 02.11.1984 Original published format: NL 8403324 | [1986/21] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181665 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181665 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G08C15/00 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08C15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nachrichtenübertragung in einem digitalen Übertragungssystem | [1986/21] | English: | Method of transmitting information in a digital transmission system | [1986/21] | French: | Méthode de transmission d'information dans un système de transmission numérique | [1986/21] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 14.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU475417 ; | [A]FR2283493 (THOMSON CSF [AR]); | [A]DE3119119 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, June 1975, IEEE, New York, US; J. HUBER et al.: "Simple asynchronous multiplex system for unidirectional low-data-rate transmission" |