EP0182430 - Light-emitting diodes array and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | For:DE
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1986/34] | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130 Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1986/22] | For:FR
R.T.C. LA RADIOTECHNIQUE-COMPELEC Société anonyme dite: 51 rue Carnot BP 301 F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varon, Jacques Societe Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Mahieu, Marc Societe Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Jacquard, Philippe, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85201836.5 | 11.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | FR19840017894 | 23.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417894 | [1986/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182430 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182430 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L25/04 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Leuchtdiodenanordnung und ihr Herstellungsverfahren | [1986/22] | English: | Light-emitting diodes array and method for its production | [1986/22] | French: | Matrice de diodes electroluminescentes et son procédé de fabrication | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2080849 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC); | [Y]DE2235865 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]GB1532286 (ELLIOTT BROS); | [A]FR2413792 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [A]GB2035689 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]GB2085227 (PHILIPS NV) |