EP0182431 - Universal tiltable and slidable sunroof for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.08.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALLKO S.r.l. Via Valeggio, 41 I-10129 Torino / IT | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alfonso, Lelio Largo Sempione, 176 I-10155 - Torino / IT | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 85201840.7 | 11.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | IT19840068147 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: IT 6814784 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182431 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182431 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/047, B60J7/19 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
B60J7/0573 (EP,US);
B60J7/0435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Schiebe-Hebedach für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1986/22] | English: | Universal tiltable and slidable sunroof for motor vehicles | [1986/22] | French: | Toit ouvrant inclinable et coulissant pour véhicules automobiles | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1990
29.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Vermeulen-Hollandia Octrooien II B.V. Küppersweg 9-15 NL- 2013 EA HAARLEM / NL Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1990
29.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Vermeulen-Hollandia Octrooien II B.V. Küppersweg 9-15 NL- 2013 EA HAARLEM / NL Opponent's representative Metman, Karel Johannes Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | 15.03.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.08.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.05.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.1989 | BE | 12.04.1989 | SE | 12.04.1989 | CH | 30.11.1989 | LI | 30.11.1989 | GB | 11.11.1990 | [2002/40] |
Former [1991/52] | AT | 12.04.1989 | |
BE | 12.04.1989 | ||
CH | 12.04.1989 | ||
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
SE | 12.04.1989 | ||
GB | 11.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/08] | AT | 12.04.1989 | |
BE | 12.04.1989 | ||
CH | 12.04.1989 | ||
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
SE | 12.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 12.04.1989 | |
CH | 12.04.1989 | ||
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
SE | 12.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/05] | CH | 12.04.1989 | |
LI | 12.04.1989 | ||
SE | 12.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 12.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2318047 (ROCKWELL GOLDE GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2078295 (VERMEULEN HOLLANDIA OCTROOIEN); | [A]FR2495068 (VERMEULEN HOLLANDIA OCTROOIEN [NL]); | [A]FR2525159 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]); | [A]FR2525161 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]); | [A]FR2525156 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]); | [A]FR2529516 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0113551 |