EP0184868 - Electron-beam device and semiconducteur device for use in such an electron-beam device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoeberechts, Arthur Marie Eugene INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Gorkom, Gerardus Gegorius Petrus INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201866.2 | 13.11.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | NL19840003613 | 28.11.1984 Original published format: NL 8403613 | [1986/25] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184868 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184868 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/48, H01J3/02 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
H01J29/481 (EP,US);
H01J3/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/25] | Title | German: | Elektronenstrahlvorrichtung und Halbleitervorrichtung zur Verwendung in solch einer Elektronenstrahlvorrichtung | [1986/25] | English: | Electron-beam device and semiconducteur device for use in such an electron-beam device | [1986/25] | French: | Dispositif à faisceau d'électrons et dispositif semi-conducteur destiné à être utilisé dans un tel dispositif à faisceau d'électrons | [1986/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 25.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5738528 ; | [A]GB2109156 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]EP0086431 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 107 (E-113) [985], 17th June 1982, page 133 E 113; & JP - A - 57 38 528 (HAMAMATSU TELEVISION K.K.) 03-03-1982, & JP5738528 A 00000000 |