EP0185434 - Controlled cracking of alpha-olefin polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/26] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davison, Sol 11919 Pebble Rock Drive Houston, TX 77077 / US | [1990/06] |
Former [1986/26] | 01 /
Davison, Sol 11919 Pebble Rock Drive Houston Texas 77077 / US | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/26] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 85202103.9 | 18.12.1985 | [1986/26] | Priority number, date | US19840683748 | 19.12.1984 Original published format: US 683748 | [1986/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0185434 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0185434 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185434 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/50, C08F10/00 | [1986/26] | CPC: |
C08F8/50 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92857 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29K2023/14 (EP,US);
B29K2029/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/50, C08F110/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/26] | Title | German: | Kontrolliertes Crackverfahren von alpha-Olefinpolymerisaten | [1986/26] | English: | Controlled cracking of alpha-olefin polymers | [1986/26] | French: | Craquage contrôlé de polymères alpha-oléfiniques | [1986/26] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3144436 (EUGENE GREENE ROBERT, et al); | [A]GB1043082 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [A]US3444155 (FISH JOHN J); | [A]EP0079687 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) |