EP0191202 - Optical fibres doped with fluorine and process for their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Peter, Dr. Karlstrasse 55 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Geittner, Peter, Dr. Ronheider Weg 26 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Leers, Dieter Wolferskaul 21 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Wilson, Howard Königsberger Strasse 32 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Piegler, Harald, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Piegler, Harald, Dipl.-Chem., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85202113.8 | 19.12.1985 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | DE19853500672 | 11.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3500672 | [1986/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191202 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191202 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191202 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/018, G02B6/10 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
C03B37/01413 (EP,US);
C03B37/01807 (EP,US);
C03B37/0183 (EP,US);
C03C13/045 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/34] | C03B37/018 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Lichtleitfaser mit Fluordotierung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1986/34] | English: | Optical fibres doped with fluorine and process for their production | [1986/34] | French: | Fibres optiques dopées par le fluor et leur procédé de fabrication | [1986/34] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.12.1990 | [1991/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2046239 (POST OFFICE); | [X]GB2100464 (BICC PLC); | [Y]GB2129152 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [Y]EP0127227 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) | [Y] - 100 ACTA FREQUENZA, Band 52, Nr. 2, März-April 1983, Seiten 98-102, Mailand, IT; E. ODONE et al.: "Very low-loss highly reproducible optical fibres by a pressurized M.C.V.D. method" |