EP0227861 - Method for measuring a physical value provided with numerical data by the use of analog data measuring devices and measuring apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARCO AUTOMATION, NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP Frankrijklaan 18 B-8970 Poperinge / BE | [1987/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanstaen, Roland Vogelzanglaan 30 B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Bossard, Franz, et al BOSSARD CONSULTANTS S.P.R.L. 288, rue de Jamioulx B-6110 Montigny-le-Tilleul / BE | [1989/52] |
Former [1987/28] | Bossard, Franz ACEC - Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 4 B-6000 Charleroi / BE | Application number, filing date | 85202134.4 | 24.12.1985 | [1987/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227861 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227861 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/04, G01B11/06 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
G01B11/046 (EP,US);
G01B11/0691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Messen einer physikalischen Grösse mit numerischen Daten unter Verwendung einer analogen Messvorrichtung und Messapparat für dieses Verfahren | [1987/28] | English: | Method for measuring a physical value provided with numerical data by the use of analog data measuring devices and measuring apparatus therefor | [1987/28] | French: | Procédé de mesure d'une grandeur physique fournissant des données numériques à partir de dispositifs de mesure de valeurs analogiques et appareil de mesure appliquant ce procédé | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.1990 | NL | 04.07.1990 | SE | 04.07.1990 | LU | 31.12.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/33] | AT | 04.07.1990 | |
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 04.07.1990 | |
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 04.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3586445 (MARTIN JAMES HENRY JR); | [A]US4247764 (KISSINGER CURTIS D); | [A]DE2231776 ; | [Y]EP0073467 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0101049 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) |