EP0159102 - Blends of LLDPE, PP and EPDM or EPR for films of improved stiffness, tear and impact strength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahl, Surinder Kumar 6 Candlewood Drive West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 02 /
Canterino, Peter John 39 Mary Drive Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | 03 /
Shaw, Richard Gregg 260 Carlton Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | [1989/42] |
Former [1985/43] | 01 /
Bahl, Surinder Kumar 6 Candlewood Drive West Windsor New Jersey 08550 / US | ||
02 /
Canterino, Peter John 39 Mary Drive Towaco New Jersey 07082 / US | |||
03 /
Shaw, Richard Gregg 260 Carlton Avenue Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/04] |
Former [1985/43] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300014.9 | 02.01.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | US19840568016 | 04.01.1984 Original published format: US 568016 | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159102 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159102 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08J5/18, // (C08L23/08, 23:12, 23:16) | [1985/43] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Mischungen aus LLDPE, PP und EPDM oder EPR für Filme von verbesserter Festigkeit, Zerreissfestigkeit und Schlagfestigkeit | [1985/43] | English: | Blends of LLDPE, PP and EPDM or EPR for films of improved stiffness, tear and impact strength | [1985/43] | French: | Mélanges de LLDPE, PP et EPDM ou EPR pour des pellicules à rigidité, résistance à la déchirure et aux chocs améliorées | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/22] | 10.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3137672 (LEHANE JR JEREMIAH P); | [P]EP0102857 (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE [FR]); | [E]FR2537981 (EL PASO POLYOLEFINS [US]) |