EP0149511 - Display memory circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMSTRAD CONSUMER ELECTRONICS PLC Brentwood House 169 Kings Road Brentwood Essex / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states AMSTRAD CONSUMER ELECTRONICS PLC Brentwood House 169 Kings Road Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states SINCLAIR RESEARCH LIMITED 25 Willis Road Cambridge CB1 2AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlin, David 96, College Place London, NW1 ODJ / GB | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1985/30] | Abbott, David John Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300029.7 | 03.01.1985 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | GB19840000783 | 12.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8400783 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149511 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16, G09G1/28 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
G09G5/02 (EP);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G09G5/391 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Speicheranordnung für eine Anzeigeeinrichtung | [1985/30] | English: | Display memory circuit | [1985/30] | French: | Circuit de mémoire pour un dispositif d'affichage | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 12.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 03.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/09] | 02.09.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |