EP0150915 - Machine tool shaft drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Systems Efficiency Limited Foundry Close Foundry Lane Horsham West Sussex / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states Systems Efficiency Limited Foundry Close Foundry Lane Horsham West Sussex / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Colin William Frank 16 Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex / GB | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300103.0 | 07.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | GB19840000312 | 06.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8400312 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0150915 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150915 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23B47/16, B23C1/08 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
B23B39/167 (EP,US);
B23Q5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/32] | Title | German: | Spindelantrieb für Werkzeugmaschine | [1985/32] | English: | Machine tool shaft drive system | [1985/32] | French: | Commande de broches pour machine-outil | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 05.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.02.1986 | M02   Fee paid on   04.04.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP52145893 [ ]; | FR1424355 [ ] (LANGENDORF WATCH CO); | US4132137 [ ] (ALBERT EUGENE V); | FR1027210 [ ] (CARL SCHWEMANN) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, section M, vol. 2, no. 28, February 22, 1978 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 7715 M 77 & JP-A-52-145 893 (SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K. ), & JP52145893 A 00000000 |