EP0150118 - Antagonists of slow reacting substances of anaphylaxis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK FROSST CANADA INC. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states MERCK FROSST CANADA INC. 16711 Trans-Canada Highway Kirkland Quebec H9H 3L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rokach, Joshua 416 P.Canterbury Chomedey Laval Quebec / CA | 02 /
Young, Robert N. 216 Senneville Road Senneville Quebec / CA | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Crampton, Keith John Allen, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1985/31] | Application number, filing date | 85300367.1 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | US19840573170 | 23.01.1984 Original published format: US 573170 | [1985/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150118 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150118 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150118 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C149/41, C07C147/14, C07C147/107, A61K31/195, C07D207/16 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/31] | Title | German: | Antagonisten von langsam reagierenden Substanzen bei Anaphylaxie (SRS-A) | [1985/31] | English: | Antagonists of slow reacting substances of anaphylaxis | [1985/31] | French: | Antagonistes de substances à réaction lente dans l'anaphylaxie (SRS-A) | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0056172 (FISONS PLC [GB]); | [AD]GB2058785 (GLAXO GROUP LTD) |