EP0153015 - Wafer scale integrated circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STC PLC 10, Maltravers Street London, WC2R 3HA / GB | [1986/49] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states STC PLC 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | ||
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states STANDARD TELEPHONES AND CABLES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monk, Trevor Kenneth 134, The Drive Bexley Kent / GB | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300383.8 | 30.01.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | GB19840003229 | 07.02.1984 Original published format: GB 8403229 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153015 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153015 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
G06F12/0676 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Integrierte Wafer-Scale-Schaltungen | [1985/35] | English: | Wafer scale integrated circuits | [1985/35] | French: | Circuits intégrés wafer-scale | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 12.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/04] | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4001786 ; | [X]US4025903 |