EP0150129 - Method and apparatus for lithographic rotate and repeat processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC. 611 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siddall, Graham J. 2887 Woodside Road Woodside California 94062 / US | 02 /
Eaton, Steven Glen 380 Curtner Avenue No. 1 Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 03 /
Kruger, James B. 164 Kelly Avenue Half Moon Bay California 94019 / US | 04 /
Garrettson, Garrett A. 14495 Miranda Road Los Altos California 94022 / US | 05 /
Neukermans, Armand P. 3510 Arbutus Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1986/50] | Cline, Roger Ledlie EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | ||
Former [1985/31] | Cline, Roger Ledlie STANLEY, POPPLEWELL, POOLE 57 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300440.6 | 23.01.1985 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | US19840573524 | 24.01.1984 Original published format: US 573524 | [1985/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150129 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150129 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150129 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G03B41/00 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
G03F7/70425 (EP,US);
G03F7/70433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die repetitive und rotative lithographische Behandlung | [1985/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for lithographic rotate and repeat processing | [1985/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le traitement lithographique répétitif et rotatif | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 24.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3181419 (KNAUP DAVID R, et al) |