EP0161737 - Electrochemical reductions of cyanopyridine bases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REILLY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states REILLY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | ||
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states REILLY TAR & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1510 Market Square Center Indianapolis Indiana 46204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toomey, Joseph E., Jr. 2035 Rosedale Indianapolis Indiana 46227 / US | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300794.6 | 06.02.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | US19840597013 | 05.04.1984 Original published format: US 597013 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161737 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161737 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/04, C07D213/38 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C25B3/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Reduktion von Cyanpyridin-Basen | [1985/47] | English: | Electrochemical reductions of cyanopyridine bases | [1985/47] | French: | Réductions électrochimiques de bases de cyanopyridine | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 04.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2259162 (BASF AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 11, 12th March 1984, page 531, no. 85550k, Columbus, Ohio, US; N. AYYASWAMI et al.: "Electrosynthesis of 3-aminomethylpyridine" & TRANS. SAEST 1983, 18(2), 123-125 | [AD] - COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 25, no. 4, 1960, pages 1510-1513; J. VOLKE et al.: "Polarographie aromatischer heterocyclischer Verbindungen VII. Reduktion der Nitrile der Pyridincarbonsäuren" |