EP0153107 - Clock recovery apparatus and method for a ring-type data communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRIME COMPUTER, INC. Prime Park Natick Massachusetts 01760 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states PRIME COMPUTER, INC. Prime Park Natick Massachusetts 01760 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogan, Thomas C. 25 Village Rock Lane Natick Massachusetts 01760 / US | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300856.3 | 08.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | US19840579198 | 10.02.1984 Original published format: US 579198 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153107 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153107 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
H04L7/0337 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Taktrückgewinnung für ein ringförmiges Datenübertragungsnetzwerk | [1985/35] | English: | Clock recovery apparatus and method for a ring-type data communications network | [1985/35] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la récupération de l'horloge dans un réseau de communication de données en anneau | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 12.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/13] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0037299 ; | [X]US4189622 ; | [X]GB1202038 ; | [X]EP0023852 ; | [A]US4119796 ; | [XP]GB2129658 |