EP0156479 - Lithium alumino-silicate glass ceramics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ENGLISH ELECTRIC COMPANY LIMITED 1, Stanhope Gate London W1A 1EH / GB | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Partridge, Graham Church Lea Sellman Street Gnosall Stafford, ST20 0EP / GB | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Keppler, William Patrick The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1986/08] |
Former [1985/40] | Keppler, William Patrick Central Patent Department Wembley Office The General Electric Company, p.l.c. Hirst Research Centre East Lane Wembley Middlesex HA9 7PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300940.5 | 13.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | GB19840005120 | 28.02.1984 Original published format: GB 8405120 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156479 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156479 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03C1/00, C03C10/12 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
C03C1/004 (EP);
C03C10/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Glaskeramiken auf Basis von Lithium-Aluminosilikat | [1985/40] | English: | Lithium alumino-silicate glass ceramics | [1985/40] | French: | Vitrocéramiques d'aluminosilicate de lithium | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 26.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.1990
29.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | [1990/10] | 20.02.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.08.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.05.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/06] | CH | 12.04.1989 | |
LI | 12.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP45004869B ; | [A]US2971853 (STOOKEY STANLEY D); | [X]US3490984 (PETTICREW RICHARD W, et al); | [XD]FR2137870 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 4, 27th July 1970, page 234, no. 18134p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-B-45 004869 (SHIBATA HARIOGARASU CO., LTD.) 18-02-1970, & JP45004869B B 00000000 | Examination | - Le Verre, H. Scholze, 1974, pages 205-215 |