EP0158413 - Low insertion force electrical connector with stress controlled contacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walse, Alan 416 S. Edgewood LaGrange Illinois 60525 / US | 02 /
Stipanuk, John 162 Hedge Ct. Glen Ellyn Illinois 60137 / US | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301007.2 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | US19840597333 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: US 597333 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158413 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158413 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158413 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/193, H01R23/68 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
H01R12/83 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/42] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Stecker mit geringer notwendiger Einsteckkraft und mit beanspruchungsüberwachten Kontakten | [1985/42] | English: | Low insertion force electrical connector with stress controlled contacts | [1985/42] | French: | Connecteur électrique à faible force d'insertion avec contrôle des contraintes de contacts | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/47] | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2537281 ; | [X]DE2434628 ; | [A]DE2654368 ; | [A]DE2557042 ; | [AD]US3701071 ; | [A]DE2621984 ; | [AD]US3920303 ; | [AD]US3795888 |